Financial history RAMSEY MANOR LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1033492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £14.56k £11.68k £17.37k £14.83k £13.98k
Total expenditure £22.81k £6.67k £9.30k £17.94k £12.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £100 N/A N/A