HOLT PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holt Pre-School is a community pre-school and is managed by a Trustee Committee of parents. Holt Pre-School is open during term time only and a maximum of 20 children can attend at any one time. Children can attend from the age of two until they start school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
- 18 December 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HOLT VILLAGE HALL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.30k | £32.86k | £52.81k | £70.00k | £77.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.59k | £32.69k | £47.32k | £51.00k | £71.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 11 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 11 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 13 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 13 May 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 22 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 07 July 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 10 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1993 AS AMENDED 20TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window