Trustees THE CARDIFF U3A
Charity number: 1033518

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bridget Palmer | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wass | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Catherine White | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Baines | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jewsbury | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Joy Griffiths | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thomas | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Susan Evans | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Margaret Richards | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIO GREENING | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.