WHITWORTH CARE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide meals-on-wheels, luncheon club facilities, day care and residential care and other amenities or benefits for the elderly and disabled, normally resident in the Township of Whitworth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 18 February 1994: Standard registration
- 07 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WHITWORTH ELDERLY AND DISABLED CARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.95k | £252.30k | £258.01k | £373.53k | £302.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.94k | £329.85k | £328.40k | £376.96k | £358.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 19 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 19 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 07 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 07 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 02 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
02 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 18 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 20 December 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15/04/1993 AS AMENDED ON 23/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MEALS ON WHEELS LUNCHEON CLUB FACILITIES DAYCARE AND RESIDENTIAL CARE AND OTHER AMENITIES OR BENEFITS FOR THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED NORMALLY RESIDENT IN THE AREA KNOWN AS THE TOWNSHIP OF WHITWORTH
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF WHITWORTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window