THE IPSWICH FILM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Showing films to members. Holding informal lectures and film-related activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CLARE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Gareth David Russell Jones | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Terry Cloke | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HAWKES | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
TRUDI KEEBLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERESA MARGUERITE VENABLES MUSSETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.06k | £0 | £3.49k | £9.13k | £9.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.67k | £0 | £3.74k | £6.31k | £8.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JUNE 1948, AS AMENDED ON 10 MAY 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION IN FILM AS AN ART AND AS A MEDIUM OF IMFORMATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE EXHIBITION OF FILMS OF A CULTURAL, EDUCATION, SCIENTIFIC AND ARTISIC CHARACTER AND BY THE HOLDING OF LECTURES AND DISCUSSIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE, IPSWICH AND IMMEDIATELY SURROUN
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Alpe Street
IPSWICH
IP1 3NZ
- Phone:
- 01473413609
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window