TOLLGATE PRIMARY SCHOOL P.T.A.
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for education/training of children/young people. Makes grants to organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 February 1994: Standard registration
- 11 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.31k | £20.45k | £21.58k | £18.76k | £14.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.78k | £12.92k | £27.26k | £16.27k | £25.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCTOBER 1983, AS AMENDED 30 NOVEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE BURY ST EDMUNDS, SUFFOLK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window