LINCOLN HALL PRE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lincoln Hall preschool is an early years provider for funded children aged 2- 5 years. We have highly qualified staff with a range of knowledge and expertise. We are passionate for Inclusion which is reflected in the children we have attending, providing a safe, stimulating environment around children's interest, to flourish and reach their full potential according to their individual needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £417,317 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 18 February 1994: Standard registration
- LINCOLN HALL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry-Ann Baldoni | Chair | 06 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sultana Ferdausi | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
SAHRA MIRE | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Leonard Robert Emms | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Emms | Trustee | 04 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £412.11k | £385.71k | £367.51k | £394.26k | £422.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £375.32k | £400.57k | £393.08k | £401.93k | £422.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £334.75k | N/A | £417.32k | |
|
Income from government grants | £407.95k | £384.60k | N/A | £390.11k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/12/1993 AS AMENDED ON 31/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS (POPLAR NEIGHBOU
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lincoln hall preschool
The linc Centre
70 fern street
Bow
London
E3 3PR
- Phone:
- 02079878057
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window