HALLIWICK PENGUINS SWIMMING CLUB

Charity Number: 1033588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Teaches swimming and water safety to people of all ages with a disability using the 'Halliwick Concept'.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £49,565
Total expenditure: £2,606

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Enfield
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 February 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • H P S C (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christina Symeonides Trustee 25 November 2023
None on record
Debra Tracey Fisher Trustee 08 October 2022
None on record
Jacqueline White MBE Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
WILLIAM WYATT MBE Trustee 10 April 1997
HALLIWICK ASSOCIATION OF SWIMMING THERAPY
Received: On time
HALLIWICK ASTRA ONE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.40k £3.35k £5.70k £3.37k £49.57k
Total expenditure £6.17k £1.61k £1.33k £1.54k £2.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 November 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hollycrofts
Walnut Tree Lane
Loose
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME15 9RQ
Phone:
07795147964