QUEENS PARK BANGLADESH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Education/Training Medical/Health/Sickness Disability Relief of Poverty Overseas aid/Famine relief Religious activities Arts/culture Sport/recreation Environment/Conservation/Heritage Economic/Community development/Employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,577 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brent
- City Of Westminster
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 23 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruman Miah | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Afsana Aktar | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
MD Shirajul Islam | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
MD Al-Aman Miah | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mustak Kabir | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shamshu Miah | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Azad Miah | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dali Begum | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Hussain | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
abdul malik | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
BULBUL AHMED | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
RAFUL MIAH | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Helal Uddin | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
moinul islam moin | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sorwar Miah | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.87k | £56.55k | £57.01k | £56.34k | £124.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.18k | £46.08k | £56.12k | £59.35k | £123.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.20k | N/A | £12.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 6 DECEMBER 1994, 5 MAY 1996, 7 FEBRUARY 1999 AND 8 MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR OF THE BANGLADESH COMMUNITY RESIDING IN THE QUEENS PARK, HARROW ROAD AND WESTBOURNE PARK WARD OF THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER. (A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON HEALTH, HOUSING, SOCIAL SECURITY AND ALLIED ISSUES; (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
QUEENS PARK AREA OF NORTH WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Queens Park Bangladesh Association
1st Floor
258 Harrow Road
London
- Phone:
- 02036094691
- Email:
- info@queensparkba.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window