Financial history MERRYHILLS PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1033591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £32.65k £17.47k £42.99k £45.57k £46.77k
Total expenditure £45.04k £7.30k £53.90k £16.80k £49.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A