AVON SMALL SAINTS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Pre-School education for children aged 2-5 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income includes £1,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
- 20 July 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 July 2018: Funds transferred to 1160180 AVON SMALL SAINTS PRE-SCHOOL
- AVON PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.04k | £62.19k | £89.91k | £71.64k | £116.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.62k | £65.68k | £71.80k | £88.96k | £119.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 17 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2017
(These accounts |
17 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 30 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
30 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 17 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 17 May 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 16 May 2016 | 321 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 17 May 2016 | 322 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JUNE 1987 AS AMENDED 1 JUNE 1992 AND 29 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window