BIRDWELL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RAISE FUNDS AND PROVIDE ACTIVITIES OVER AND ABOVE THE PROVISION PROVIDED BY THE SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Somerset
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rehema Barry | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Marie Sinclair | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Elizabeth Fuller | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Broadbent | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Sarah Ayre | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.15k | £8.78k | £17.92k | £8.12k | £16.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.87k | £6.01k | £11.16k | £11.53k | £11.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 August 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIRDWELL SCHOOL ASSOCATION
C/O BIRDWELL PRIMARY SCHOOL
HOLLIS CLOSE
LONG ASHTON
BRISTOL
BS41 9AZ
- Phone:
- 01275 392496
- Email:
- pta@birdwellschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window