AQUARIUS WOMEN'S CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ladies Monthly meetings to promote social, educational and recreational activities. Incorporating fund raising for annually nominated charities and own financial needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
- 04 July 2019: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £1.28k | £1.60k | £1.84k | £1.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68k | £1.16k | £1.55k | £1.65k | £1.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 24 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 07 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 03 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/12/1993 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR WOMEN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window