Financial history SMALL WONDERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1033685
Charity reporting is up to date (241 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £123.04k £95.23k £119.10k £136.69k £117.48k
Total expenditure £114.22k £90.30k £110.26k £119.41k £140.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £92.88k £99.56k £91.66k
Income from government grants £86.00k £67.55k £200 N/A N/A