Accounts and annual returns BARTON ST DAVID PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1033698
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 July 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 July 2021 19 days late