Governing document MERSEYSIDE ASBESTOS VICTIMS SUPPORT GROUP
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JUNE 1992 AS AMENDED 9 FEBRUARY 1994, 11 AUGUST 1998, 9 NOVEMBER 1999, 30 JUNE 2004 AND 31 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF VICTIMS OF ASBESTOS, ESPECIALLY THOSE WITH MESOTHELIOMA, IN PARTICULAR BY:(A) THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND INFORMATION SERVICE, (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE PROVISION OF TREATMENT, MEDICAL AIDS OR MEANS TO ENABLE SUCH PEOPLE TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN MERSEYSIDE AND ITS ENVIRONS IN PARTICULAR, CONCERNING THE DANGER AND HAZARDS OF ASBESTOS.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.