Financial history MUSWELL HILL TOY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1033753
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £1.07k £814 £1.09k £541 £216
Total expenditure £1.09k £709 £969 £573 £70
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A