Financial history THE WENTWORTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1033755
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £29.89k £26.17k £23.18k £24.65k £38.90k
Total expenditure £33.71k £27.79k £12.10k £33.76k £37.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A