Trustees THE WENTWORTH ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1033755

Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heidi Mansell | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zelldra Schutte | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah SMITH | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Mercer | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hutchson | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Filsell | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Coleman | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Cairns | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Thurston | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Poston | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Walker | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vikki Crickmay | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sian Hand | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Simpson | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Brand | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ami Whiskin | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Pask | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jo Koster | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matt Langson | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Wright | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elderton | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.