HADLEIGH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the benefits of music education and choral singing for personal well-being, and to the public by local concert performances in Hadleigh, SUFFOLK, and surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Lesley Riddle | Chair | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth French | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Jamieson | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martina Beatrix Shorts | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary McGonnell | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Turnbull | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Jones | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Helen Mary Bailey | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurie Lesley Denton | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.66k | £6.21k | £18.73k | £26.07k | £27.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.55k | £1.91k | £20.27k | £28.40k | £27.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.88k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 1989.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA AND DANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Thatched Cottage
Water Run
Hitcham
IPSWICH
IP7 7LN
- Phone:
- 07825150671
- Email:
- LLD765@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window