FRIENDS AT LARK RISE LOWER SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an Academy school PTA and raise funds throughout the year to purchase school equipment and to help provide a safe and enriching environment. This year we provided new libraries for each key stage. We hold fetes, raffles, discos and quiz nights for the parents and children at the school. It is run by the parents and teachers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 September 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 28 February 1994: Standard registration
- FRIENDS AT LARKRISE LOWER SCHOOL (Working name)
- LARK RISE P T A (Working name)
- LARK RISE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Bryson | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Catling | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Williams | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Wynn | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Kenyon | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Trimbee | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/09/2017 | 03/09/2018 | 03/09/2019 | 03/09/2020 | 03/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.37k | £15.84k | £6.83k | £5.34k | £3.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.90k | £16.73k | £9.92k | £5.80k | £5.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days | |
Annual return | 03 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 670 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 670 days | |
Annual return | 03 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2019 | 15 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED 5TH DECEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lark Rise Academy
Cartmel Drive
DUNSTABLE
LU6 3PT
- Phone:
- 01582607852
- Email:
- Office@larkrise.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window