STUDLEY GREEN COMMUNITY DAY CARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities involve operating a weekly Day Care Centre, which operates for 46 weeks of the year, with lunch, followed by discussions, Bingo sessions and other activities. In addition 1 outing is arranged each year to accessible seaside and/or historic towns including locally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 25 February 1994: Standard registration
- STUDLEY GREEN DAY CARE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOB BRICE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Irene Green | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Welsh | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ernie Brown | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN DOROTHY DAVIS | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS FRASER ROSS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.78k | £12.26k | £11.54k | £3.85k | £8.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.53k | £11.59k | £11.05k | £3.41k | £7.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.86k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.34k | £2.85k | £2.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 535 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 535 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREINAFTER MAY BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR THE RESIDENTS OF STUDLEY GREEN TROWBRIDGE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE AND/OR INFIRMITY.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE STUDLEY GREEN TROWBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 WESTWOOD ROAD
TROWBRIDGE
BA14 9BR
- Phone:
- 01225762524
- Email:
- dfraserross@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window