BLOFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1033893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RAISING FUNDS FOR CHILDREN AT BLOFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL TO AID THEIR FURTHER EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £23,429
Total expenditure: £16,888

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Jane Humphrey Chair 16 September 2021
None on record
Nicola Louise Ledain Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Leanne Gedge Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
Charlotte Marie Ayres Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.77k £1.10k £22.84k £17.31k £23.43k
Total expenditure £1.21k £274 £9.54k £17.61k £16.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 25 July 2024 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 July 2024 401 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BLOFIELD CP SCHOOL
NORTH STREET
BLOFIELD
NORWICH
NR13 4RH
Phone:
01603717099