Financial history HECKINGTON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1033905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/04/2020 03/04/2021 03/04/2022 03/04/2023 03/04/2024
Total gross income £5.96k £3.00k £4.34k £9.09k £9.74k
Total expenditure £5.34k £2.50k £2.50k £8.67k £9.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A