Accounts and annual returns THE CHASE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1033941
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 28 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 28 June 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 20 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 22 May 2009 On Time