HILLSIDE RAILWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is aware that because the long established hobby of model railways is pursued by individuals that the work and achievement of pioneer modellers is lost after their death. This loss adversley affects our heritage. The purpose of the trust is to address this problem, and in particular to conserve the historic model railway created by the late Dr R Preston Hendry (1912-1991) for the benef
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
elena aleksandrovna hendry | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DUDLEY RODNEY WOODCOCK | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
robert hendry LLB FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL GRIFFITH HODGSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225 | £240 | £75 | £150 | £75 | |
|
Total expenditure | £205 | £230 | £75 | £147 | £70 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 25 November 2021 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE MAINTAIN AND EXHIBIT FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION THE HISTORIC MODEL RAILWAY CREATED BY THE LATE DOCTOR ROBERT PRESTON HENDRY KNOWN AS THE GREENLAND AND HILLSIDE RAILWAY AND TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND INTEREST IN THE PRESERVATION AND OPERATION OF MODEL RAILWAY EQUIPMENT AND ROLLING STOCK OF HISTORICAL INTEREST GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 MOULTRIE ROAD
RUGBY
CV21 3BD
- Phone:
- 01624813355
- Email:
- eIrokits@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window