REIGATE & REDHILL MUSIC AND DRAMA FESTIVAL

Charity Number: 1034060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To mount annually an open competitive and non-competitive festival in Music, Speech and Drama for amateur performers of all ages.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £26,038
Total expenditure: £23,146

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • REIGATE AND REDHILL MUSIC FESTIVAL (Previous name)
  • REIGATE AND REDHILL MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Patrick Chair 14 September 2021
REIGATE AND REDHILL FESTIVAL
Recently registered
Jacqueline Bennett Trustee 08 February 2024
REIGATE AND REDHILL FESTIVAL
Recently registered
Richard John Craig Morgan Trustee 08 February 2024
None on record
Lynfa Landauer Trustee 27 September 2022
EPSOM CHAMBER CHOIR
Received: On time
REIGATE AND REDHILL FESTIVAL
Recently registered
Nick Landauer Trustee 27 September 2022
REIGATE AND REDHILL FESTIVAL
Recently registered
David James Fisher Trustee 01 August 2019
REIGATE AND REDHILL FESTIVAL
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.91k £11.83k £13.63k £19.19k £26.04k
Total expenditure £2.84k £5.17k £16.34k £17.14k £23.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 07 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 14 June 2024 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 Rushworth Road
REIGATE
Surrey
RH2 0QF
Phone:
07767 872999