Accounts and annual returns DANDELION CLOCK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1034067
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2011 08 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 22 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 31 May 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 10 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 29 March 2010 On Time