THE PROJECT GENESIS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regeneration of Derwentside area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 28 February 1994: Standard registration
- PROJECT GENESIS TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Robinson | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Clark | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Virginia Aken | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas William Maddison | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Barry Rowland | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Janice Lynne Cook | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Shield | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
DEAN RICHARDS | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
David Gray | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON ROBESON | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
John O'Connor | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.37k | £250.65k | £90.62k | £14.27k | £9.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £616.44k | £43.99k | £31.79k | £12.96k | £42.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £267.02k | £248.09k | £466 | £12.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 FEBRUARY 1994 as amended on 24 Sept 2010
Charitable objects
ALL SUCH OBJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE DISTRICT OF DERWENTSIDE OR ITS INHABITANTS OR OTHERWISE CONNECTED WITH THE DISTRICT OF DERWENTSIDE AS ARE CHARITABLE INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT DETRACTING FROM THE GENERAL NATURE OF THE CHARITABLE TRUST) ANY OF THE FOLLOWING: 1.PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION.2.PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY APPRECIATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE ARTS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO AN ARTS CENTRE).3.ENCOURAGING THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF LOCAL HISTORY AND OTHER MATTERS OF HISTORIC ARTISTIC ARCHITECTURAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A HERITAGE CENTRE):AND 4.THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF AMENITY LAND AND ITS FLORA AND FAUNA.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF DERWENTSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Steel House
Ponds Court Business Park
Genesis Way
CONSETT
County Durham
DH8 5XP
- Phone:
- +44 7763364203
- Email:
- joc4rugby@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window