UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE - READING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION & SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR THOSE PERSONS RETIRED OR IN SEMI-RETIREMENT IN AND AROUND READING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 01 March 1994: Standard registration
- U 3 A READING (Working name)
- U3A READING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Morton | Chair | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ellis | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Broderick | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Rampley | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ann Thomas | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RUDDLE | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rosalind Susan Luper | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harvey Nolan James Smith | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Elizabeth Rahman | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Yvonne Rixon | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.95k | £534 | £16.37k | £24.22k | £15.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.36k | £7.82k | £8.22k | £24.25k | £20.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1989 AS AMENDED 27 NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 25 Sep 2023 as amended on 25 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN READING AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Area of benefit
READING AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Bay Tree Rise
Calcot
READING
RG31 4RG
- Phone:
- 07845 725644
- Email:
- secretary@readingu3a.org.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window