Financial history UNITED REFORMED CHURCH PLAYGROUP (FULWOOD)

Charity number: 1034109
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £15.20k £14.96k £13.82k £28.05k £25.71k
Total expenditure £14.96k £13.70k £14.03k £27.67k £25.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A