LATHAM LANE PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
sessional day care for pre-school children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 08 March 1994: Standard registration
- 15 April 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 April 2010: Funds transferred to 1129483 LATHAM LANE PLAYGROUP
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.89k | £53.12k | £70.24k | £31.23k | £64.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.29k | £46.84k | £57.87k | £45.69k | £69.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 22 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 22 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 27 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 27 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 06 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 27 November 2008 | 150 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 25 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 18 September 2007 | 80 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 10 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 10 May 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window