Accounts and annual returns PENCADER WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1034125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 18 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required