1ST FLECKNEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides education and training for children aged 6 to 14 through Scouting Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £1,775 from 3 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 02 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Robin Ward MBE | Chair | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Skinner | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janine Ann Trinder | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christelle Denise Coggon | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Trevor Robinson | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Callum James Ivan Ward | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RICHARD LACEY | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert John McAulay | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ERIC STANLEY GAMBLE | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Ruth Kathleen Hughes | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.64k | £22.50k | £31.91k | £19.84k | £16.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.40k | £7.29k | £10.09k | £14.97k | £13.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £21.77k | £5.63k | £1.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Headquarters
High Street
Fleckney
Leicester
LE8 8AJ
- Phone:
- 07970286789
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window