RICHMONDSHIRE SUBSCRIPTION CONCERTS

Charity number: 1034173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS BOARD SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024

Total income: £19,446
Total expenditure: £20,233

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RICHMONDSHIRE CONCERTS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fionagh Mary Bennet Trustee 26 November 2024
None on record
Mary Elizabeth Allison Trustee 05 July 2024
None on record
Douglas William Manning Waugh Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
Annette Jane Clark Trustee 21 June 2022
THE RICHMOND SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
RICHMONDSHIRE REFUGEE SUPPORT GROUP
Recently registered
Naomi Jane Meredith Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Thomas Simon Osorio Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Christopher Shaw Trustee 21 June 2017
None on record
Judy Moorhouse Trustee 10 June 2015
None on record
ANNA JACKSON Trustee
CLEVELAND CHAMBER ORCHESTRA
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023 30/05/2024
Total gross income £19.16k £1.31k £22.10k £20.10k £19.45k
Total expenditure £18.36k £518 £26.23k £20.33k £20.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2021 20 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
65 Frenchgate
RICHMOND
North Yorkshire
DL10 7AE
Phone:
07493008860