1ST SNAITH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1034194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scout group for children aged 6and a half to 16 and a half. Boys and girls. Meeting every week, camping, adventure holidays, climbing orienteering, cooking swimming,first aid, helping the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £26,382
Total expenditure: £29,696

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jamie Clifford Gutteridge Chair 22 January 2022
None on record
Ross Robert McKenzie Trustee 22 January 2022
None on record
Laura Gungaram-Smith Trustee 04 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.24k £4.67k £31.46k £41.30k £26.38k
Total expenditure £28.93k £6.49k £30.40k £45.01k £29.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 March 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 March 2024 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rawcliffe Grange Farm
Rawcliffe Road
Rawcliffe
Goole
DN14 8SD
Phone:
01405862851