Financial history KIBWORTH PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1034195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £16.26k £5.78k £917 £1.14k £4.93k
Total expenditure £15.79k £5.25k £674 £1.26k £8.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A