84TH LEICESTER (LITTLETHORPE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1034202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting activities - children and young persons.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £15,917
Total expenditure: £16,843

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1994: Standard registration
  • 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 24 October 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger M Beck Trustee 09 July 2018
None on record
MR P COOPER Trustee 12 March 1992
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.78k £22.68k £8.94k £17.36k £15.92k
Total expenditure £17.70k £9.77k £10.97k £21.35k £16.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.92k N/A £4.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24A Welford Road
BLABY
LEICESTER
LE8 4FS
Phone:
01162772864