FRIENDS OF KINGS SCHOOL, ROCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run several events during the year at our school to raise money to give the children things that school would not normally pay for.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Medway
Governance
- 02 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK GRAHAM SNOSWELL | Chair | 04 December 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.41k | £6.24k | £33.29k | £40.09k | £41.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.99k | £21.22k | £32.99k | £47.23k | £28.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 October 2024 | 460 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 December 2024 | 523 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2022 | 322 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 1994 AND AMENDED JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kings School Rochester
Satis House
Boley Hill
Rochester
ME1 1TE
- Phone:
- 01634 888555
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window