Financial history HAMPTON IN ARDEN PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE

Charity Number: 1034251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £35.80k £34.03k £30.80k £45.36k £56.11k
Total expenditure £28.46k £36.15k £31.14k £41.71k £72.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £14.38k £16.18k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A