HAMPTON IN ARDEN PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1034251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides pre school 4 mornings per week. Curriculum planned in accordance with early years requirements.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £56,105
Total expenditure: £72,751

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Solihull

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HAMPTON IN ARDEN PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
  • HAMPTON IN ARDEN PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Danielle Straupe Chair 01 September 2022
None on record
Katherine Taylor Trustee 14 November 2024
None on record
Jessica Barnett Trustee 14 November 2024
None on record
Bethany Alice Johnson Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Jessica Woolley Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Victoria Goode Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Jessica Elizabeth Lanzilotto Trustee 18 February 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £35.80k £34.03k £30.80k £45.36k £56.11k
Total expenditure £28.46k £36.15k £31.14k £41.71k £72.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £14.38k £16.18k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 02 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 16 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 18 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hampton-in-Arden Preschool
Shadow Brook Lane
Hampton-In-Arden
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B92 0DQ
Phone:
07527006386