THE KNIGHTS' ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN YOUTH CLUBS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides services for staff and young people in the provision youth work as follows :- As an umbrella and resource body. Training and support. Care and counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
Governance
- 03 March 1994: Standard registration
- 02 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.17k | £765 | £994 | £770 | £844 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.85k | £3.18k | £2.62k | £2.27k | £6.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 04 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 22 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 05 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 20TH FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
(A) TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS AND GIRLS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND TO PROMOTE CHRISTIAN CITIZENSHIP. (B) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS IN THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS REQUISITE FOR EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window