3RD RAYLEIGH (OUR LADY OF RANSOM) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1034357
Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scout Group providing activities and training for boys and girls between the ages of 6 and 15

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 3RD RAYLEIGH SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TONY HOCKETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.16k £13.54k £13.54k £0 £0
Total expenditure £11.89k £11.16k £13.84k £1.75k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 February 2023 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 BEDLOES AVENUE
RAWRETH
WICKFORD
SS11 8SX
Phone:
01268573314
Website:

No information available