DRAKE MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drake Music breaks down disabling barriers to music through innovative approaches to learning, teaching and making music. Our focus is on nurturing creativity through exploring music and technology in imaginative ways. We put quality music-making at the heart of everything we do, connecting disabled and non-disabled people locally, nationally and internationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,573 from 2 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 March 1994: Standard registration
- DRAKE MUSIC PROJECT (Previous name)
- DRAKE RESEARCH PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Watts | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wang | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
MX Snoof Kattekop | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Salmon | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julian Marcus Anson Stodd | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £701.87k | £720.34k | £714.86k | £717.10k | £416.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £617.04k | £571.67k | £744.36k | £649.54k | £685.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.75k | £4.00k | £11.84k | £9.40k | £1.57k | |
|
Income from government grants | £256.29k | £9.86k | £839 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £258.88k | £636.15k | £600.07k | £637.94k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £442.66k | £84.06k | £114.74k | £77.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £333 | £127 | £56 | £2.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £555.69k | £537.75k | £718.43k | £630.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £61.35k | £33.92k | £25.93k | £18.59k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.00k | £0 | £198 | £155 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 03 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 JUNE 1994, 20 JANUARY 2005, 28 JULY 2008, 10 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 18 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF MUSIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RICH MIX
35-47 BETHNAL GREEN ROAD
LONDON
E1 6LA
- Phone:
- 02077395444
- Email:
- info@drakemusic.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window