Governing document DRAKE MUSIC
Charity number: 1034374

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 03 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 JUNE 1994, 20 JANUARY 2005, 28 JULY 2008, 10 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 18 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF MUSIC
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.