Accounts and annual returns SOUTHWAY HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1034437
Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 November 2023 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required