Financial history SOUTHWAY HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1034437
Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £7.51k £8.12k £2.55k £158 £110
Total expenditure £10.77k £8.03k £10.21k £406 £431
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A