Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF ENFIELD CHARITY FUND TRUST

Charity number: 1034450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 16 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 January 2025 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required