Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF ENFIELD CHARITY FUND TRUST

Charity number: 1034450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.80k £7.36k £11.84k £11.87k £8.56k
Total expenditure £10.42k £7.36k £10.94k £9.63k £8.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A