Trustees BOURNE VALLEY DAY CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY
Charity number: 1034491
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicki Coleman | Chair | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Debra Janet Mason-Smith | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Knowles | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Dean | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ELIZABETH ATKINSON | Trustee | 18 May 1984 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.